Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate 2019 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR317

Recognizing May 14, 2019, as Alpha Kappa Alpha Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR318

Recognizing all who are working to raise colorectal cancer awareness.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR319

Recognizing March 5, 2019, as VIVA San Antonio Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR32

Recognizing February 5, 2019, as Austin County Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR320

Recognizing Brazosport College on the occasion of its 50th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR321

Recognizing March 6, 2019, as Edinburg Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR322

Congratulating Sumeyye Samento and Desiree Samford on the grand opening of 24 Karrots café.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR323

In memory of Kyrell McBride Johnson.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR324

Recognizing March 6 and 7, 2019, as Eagle Pass Legislative Days.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR325

Recognizing Bee County Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR326

Recognizing March 6, 2019, as Jackson County Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR327

Recognizing Louise Appleman on the occasion of her retirement.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR328

Recognizing March 31, 2019, and March 31, 2020, as Stop the Bleed Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR329

Recognizing Tammie Jo Shults for her heroic actions.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR33

Recognizing February 19, 2019, as Matagorda County Day.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records