Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate 2019 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR425

In memory of Gwendolyn Elaine Brown Hill.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR426

Recognizing Dillon Kennedy on the occasion of his graduation from Columbia College Chicago.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR427

Recognizing George and Virginia Williams on the occasion of their 75th wedding anniversary.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR428

Recognizing C. W. and Louise Elston on the occasion of their 75th wedding anniversary.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR429

Recognizing March 19, 2019, as Port Aransas Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR43

Recognizing the induction of the Justiss Ranch into the states's Family Land Heritage Program.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR430

Recognizing April 3, 2019, as Alzheimer's Awareness Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR431

Recognizing Robert Weist for being selected for the Employee Spotlight by the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR432

Recognizing April 2, 2019, as National Service Recognition Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR433

Recognizing March 25, 2019, as Medina County Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR434

Recognizing March 19, 2019, as Kinney County Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR435

Recognizing April 2, 2019, as Atascosa County Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR436

Recognizing March 27, 2019, as Real County Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR437

In memory of J. Taylor Brite.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR438

Congratulating the 2017 and 2018 recipients of the Lone Star Land Steward Awards and the Leopold Conservation Awards.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records