Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1071 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/06/2021

                    By: Harris, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 1071
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021;
 April 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 6, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 6, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1071 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the presence of a qualified facility dog in certain
 court proceedings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 21, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 21.012 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.012.  PRESENCE OF QUALIFIED FACILITY DOG IN COURT
 PROCEEDING. (a) In this section, "qualified facility dog" means a
 dog that is a graduate of a program operated by an assistance dog
 organization that is a member of a nationally recognized assistance
 dog association.
 (b)  Any party to an action filed in a court in this state in
 which a proceeding related to the action will be held may petition
 the court for an order authorizing a qualified facility dog to be
 present with a witness who is testifying before the court through:
 (1)  in-person testimony; or
 (2)  closed-circuit video teleconferencing testimony.
 (c)  The court may enter an order authorizing a qualified
 facility dog to accompany a witness testifying at the court
 proceeding if:
 (1)  the presence of the dog will assist the witness in
 providing testimony; and
 (2)  the party petitioning for the order provides proof
 of liability insurance coverage in effect for the dog.
 (d)  A handler who is trained to manage the qualified
 facility dog must accompany the dog provided for a witness at a
 court proceeding.
 (e)  A party to the action must petition the court for an
 order under Subsection (b) not later than the 14th day before the
 date of the court proceeding.
 (f)  A court may:
 (1)  impose restrictions on the presence of the
 qualified facility dog during the court proceeding; and
 (2)  issue instructions to the jury, as applicable,
 regarding the presence of the dog.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *