Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1090 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2021

                    By: Bailes, Rogers, White H.B. No. 1090
 (Senate Sponsor - Nichols)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 11, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appraisal for ad valorem tax purposes of real
 property that was erroneously omitted from an appraisal roll in a
 previous year.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 25.21(a), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (a)  If the chief appraiser discovers that real property was
 omitted from an appraisal roll in any one of the three [five]
 preceding tax years or that personal property was omitted from an
 appraisal roll in one of the two preceding tax years, the chief
 appraiser [he] shall appraise the property as of January 1 of each
 tax year that it was omitted and enter the property and its
 appraised value in the appraisal records.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *