Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1195 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/13/2021

                    By: Geren, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 1195
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 6, 2021;
 April 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Finance; April 13, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 14, Nays 0; April 13, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the franchise tax treatment of certain loans and grants
 made under the federal Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic
 Security Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 171, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 171.10131 to read as follows:
 Sec. 171.10131.  PROVISIONS RELATED TO CERTAIN MONEY
 RECEIVED FOR COVID-19 RELIEF. (a) In this section, "qualifying
 loan or grant proceeds" means the amount of money that:
 (1)  is received by a taxable entity in loans or grants:
 (A)  under the Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and
 Economic Security Act (15 U.S.C. Section 9001 et seq.), as amended
 by the Paycheck Protection Program Flexibility Act of 2020 (Pub. L.
 No. 116-142) and the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021 (Pub. L.
 No. 116-260); or
 (B)  from the restaurant revitalization fund
 established under Section 5003 of the American Rescue Plan Act of
 2021 (Pub. L. No. 117-2); and
 (2)  is not included in the taxable entity's gross
 income for purposes of federal income taxation under:
 (A)  Sections 276 and 278 of the Consolidated
 Appropriations Act, 2021 (Pub. L. No. 116-260); or
 (B)  Section 9673 of the American Rescue Plan Act
 of 2021 (Pub. L. No. 117-2).
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, a taxable entity:
 (1)  shall exclude from its total revenue, to the
 extent included under Section 171.1011(c)(1)(A), (c)(2)(A), or
 (c)(3), qualifying loan or grant proceeds;
 (2)  may include as a cost of goods sold under Section
 171.1012 any expense paid using qualifying loan or grant proceeds
 to the extent the expense is otherwise includable as a cost of goods
 sold under that section; and
 (3)  may include as compensation under Section 171.1013
 any expense paid using qualifying loan or grant proceeds to the
 extent the expense is otherwise includable as compensation under
 that section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to a report originally due
 on or after January 1, 2021.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *