Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1195 Fiscal Note / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/14/2021

                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 87TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             March 14, 2021       TO: Honorable Morgan Meyer, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB1195 by Geren (Relating to the forgiveness of a loan made under the Paycheck Protection Program for franchise tax purposes.), As Introduced     Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1195, As Introduced : an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2023.Additionally, the bill will have a direct impact of a revenue loss to the Property Tax Relief Fund of ($133,500,000) for the 2022-23 biennium.  Any loss to the Property Tax Relief Fund must be made up with an equal amount of General Revenue to fund the Foundation School Program.  General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2022$02023$02024$02025$02026$0All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Revenue (Loss) fromProperty Tax Relief Fund3042022($133,500,000)2023$02024$02025$02026$0 Fiscal AnalysisThe bill would amend Chapter 171, Tax Code to provide for exclusion from total revenue of the amounts of certain forgiven loans for purposes of the franchise tax.Section 171.1011 would be amended by adding Subsection (y) to provide that total revenue does not include any amount of loan forgiven under the federal Paycheck Protection Program. Qualifying expenses paid with such loan proceeds would be allowed in the determination of cost of goods sold or of compensation for subtraction from total revenue in the determination of taxable margin.The provisions of the bill would only apply to reports originally due on or after January 1, 2021. The bill would take effect September 1, 2021.

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 87TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 14, 2021

 

 

  TO: Honorable Morgan Meyer, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB1195 by Geren (Relating to the forgiveness of a loan made under the Paycheck Protection Program for franchise tax purposes.), As Introduced   

TO: Honorable Morgan Meyer, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1195 by Geren (Relating to the forgiveness of a loan made under the Paycheck Protection Program for franchise tax purposes.), As Introduced

 Honorable Morgan Meyer, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means

 Honorable Morgan Meyer, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 HB1195 by Geren (Relating to the forgiveness of a loan made under the Paycheck Protection Program for franchise tax purposes.), As Introduced 

 HB1195 by Geren (Relating to the forgiveness of a loan made under the Paycheck Protection Program for franchise tax purposes.), As Introduced 



Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1195, As Introduced : an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2023.Additionally, the bill will have a direct impact of a revenue loss to the Property Tax Relief Fund of ($133,500,000) for the 2022-23 biennium.  Any loss to the Property Tax Relief Fund must be made up with an equal amount of General Revenue to fund the Foundation School Program. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1195, As Introduced : an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2023.Additionally, the bill will have a direct impact of a revenue loss to the Property Tax Relief Fund of ($133,500,000) for the 2022-23 biennium.  Any loss to the Property Tax Relief Fund must be made up with an equal amount of General Revenue to fund the Foundation School Program. 

Additionally, the bill will have a direct impact of a revenue loss to the Property Tax Relief Fund of ($133,500,000) for the 2022-23 biennium.  Any loss to the Property Tax Relief Fund must be made up with an equal amount of General Revenue to fund the Foundation School Program.

Additionally, the bill will have a direct impact of a revenue loss to the Property Tax Relief Fund of ($133,500,000) for the 2022-23 biennium.  Any loss to the Property Tax Relief Fund must be made up with an equal amount of General Revenue to fund the Foundation School Program.



General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: 


2022 $0
2023 $0
2024 $0
2025 $0
2026 $0

All Funds, Five-Year Impact: 


2022 ($133,500,000)
2023 $0
2024 $0
2025 $0
2026 $0

 Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend Chapter 171, Tax Code to provide for exclusion from total revenue of the amounts of certain forgiven loans for purposes of the franchise tax.Section 171.1011 would be amended by adding Subsection (y) to provide that total revenue does not include any amount of loan forgiven under the federal Paycheck Protection Program. Qualifying expenses paid with such loan proceeds would be allowed in the determination of cost of goods sold or of compensation for subtraction from total revenue in the determination of taxable margin.The provisions of the bill would only apply to reports originally due on or after January 1, 2021. The bill would take effect September 1, 2021.

 Methodology

Federal law enacted in 2020 provides for exclusion of the value of forgiven Paycheck Protection Program (PPP) loans from gross income for purposes of the Internal Revenue Code. That exclusion does not apply for purposes of the Texas franchise tax, because the state tax is tied to the Internal Revenue Code as it existed in 2007.Data from the U.S. Small Business Administration on amounts by recipient of Paycheck Protection Program loans approved in 2020 was combined with comptroller franchise tax report data to estimate amounts of loan forgiveness that would be deemed revenue of taxable entities in the calculation of margin subject to apportionment to the state, multiplied by a weighted average franchise tax rate. It is assumed that PPP loans granted in 2020 would be forgiven in 2021, affecting franchise tax liabilities for reports originally due in 2022.

 Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, KK, SD

JMc, KK, SD