Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1220 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/20/2021

                    87R190 JRJ-D
 By: Shaheen H.B. No. 1220


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing the Collin County Community College
 District to offer a baccalaureate degree program in the field of
 education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter L, Chapter 130, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 130.3045 to read as follows:
 Sec. 130.3045.  BACCALAUREATE DEGREE IN EDUCATION. (a) The
 coordinating board shall authorize a baccalaureate degree program
 in the field of education at the Collin County Community College
 District.
 (b)  The limitation prescribed by Section 130.306 does not
 apply to a baccalaureate degree program offered under this section.
 (c)  Not later than January 1, 2023, the coordinating board
 shall prepare a progress report on the baccalaureate degree program
 in the field of education established under this section. Not later
 than January 1, 2025, the coordinating board shall prepare a report
 on the effectiveness of the degree program, including any
 recommendations for legislative action regarding the offering of
 baccalaureate degree programs in the field of education by a public
 junior college. The coordinating board shall deliver a copy of each
 report to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
 house of representatives, and the chair of the standing committee
 of each house of the legislature with primary jurisdiction over
 higher education. This subsection expires January 1, 2026.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.