Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1247 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2021

                    H.B. No. 1247


 AN ACT
 relating to the development of and report on a tri-agency
 work-based learning strategic framework by the Texas Workforce
 Commission, the Texas Education Agency, and the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle B, Title 4, Labor Code, is amended by
 adding Chapter 318 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 318. TRI-AGENCY WORK-BASED LEARNING STRATEGIC FRAMEWORK
 Sec. 318.001.  TRI-AGENCY WORK-BASED LEARNING STRATEGIC
 FRAMEWORK. (a) The commission, the Texas Education Agency, and the
 Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board jointly shall develop a
 strategic framework to encourage work-based learning in this state.
 Each agency shall appoint an existing agency employee to lead the
 development of the framework.
 (b)  Not later than December 31, 2022, the commission, the
 Texas Education Agency, and the Texas Higher Education Coordinating
 Board jointly shall prepare and submit to the legislature a report
 on the framework developed under Subsection (a). The report must:
 (1)  define "work-based learning opportunity" in a
 comprehensive manner that includes a variety of high-quality and
 rigorous work-based learning opportunities, such as youth
 apprenticeships, internships, simulated workplaces, service
 learning, and virtual workspaces;
 (2)  determine common language, definitions, and
 quality standards to be used by each agency for work-based learning
 opportunities that span secondary and postsecondary education;
 (3)  establish methods of identifying student and adult
 learner skills and competencies that are aligned with industry
 demand and talent needs, with a particular focus on high-demand,
 high-growth industries that offer livable wages;
 (4)  align priorities, programs, and goals across the
 agencies to ensure the development of cohesive work-based learning
 strategies that strengthen workforce pipelines;
 (5)  identify strategies for the agencies to partner
 with public primary and secondary schools, public institutions of
 higher education, businesses, workforce organizations, and
 relevant collaboratives to implement high-quality project-based
 learning in middle and junior high school classrooms and work-based
 learning experiences in high school and postsecondary education;
 (6)  provide methods of supporting partnerships
 between public institutions of higher education to create
 additional pathways for postsecondary work-based learning
 credentials of value to high-demand, high-growth industries and
 that lead to quality career opportunities;
 (7)  articulate the roles and responsibilities of
 public primary and secondary schools, public institutions of higher
 education, and workforce boards and organizations in implementing
 high-quality work-based learning programs and partnerships;
 (8)  provide a strategy for identifying industry-led
 high-quality training models that promote and replicate high-need
 jobs that lead to equitable outcomes for individuals and can be
 scaled across industries and regions;
 (9)  identify opportunities to improve and incentivize
 regional coordination across the state to better reflect regional
 workforce needs and eliminate duplicative programs, including by
 providing state support to build capacity in regional intermediary
 organizations to facilitate education-workforce partnerships and
 programs;
 (10)  identify streamlined data collection models for
 primary, secondary, and postsecondary education and workforce
 accountability that can be disaggregated as necessary to evaluate
 and increase equity in access to high-quality programs, with a
 focus on underrepresented populations;
 (11)  include recommendations to improve the
 coordination of funds and awarding of grants among the agencies to
 eliminate barriers to entry for regional partners; and
 (12)  identify any available federal funds that may be
 used for work-based learning and training and include
 recommendations regarding the use of those funds by the agencies,
 including supporting incentives for public institutions of higher
 education, work-study programs, and student advising and
 completion strategies.
 (c)  As soon as practicable after the report is submitted,
 the commission, the Texas Education Agency, and the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board shall, to the extent possible,
 implement the recommendations made under Subsection (b)(12).
 Sec. 318.002.  EXPIRATION. This chapter expires September
 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1247 was passed by the House on April
 16, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 120, Nays 25, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1247 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 114, Nays 32,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1247 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays
 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor