Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1281 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2021

                    H.B. No. 1281


 AN ACT
 relating to the operation of golf carts in certain areas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 551.403, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 551.403.  OPERATION AUTHORIZED IN CERTAIN AREAS. (a) An
 operator may operate a golf cart:
 (1)  in a master planned community:
 (A)  that is a residential subdivision as defined
 by Section 209.002(9), Property Code, or has in place a uniform set
 of restrictive covenants; and
 (B)  for which a county or municipality has
 approved one or more plats [a plat];
 (2)  on a public or private beach that is open to
 vehicular traffic; or
 (3)  on a highway for which the posted speed limit is
 not more than 35 miles per hour, if the golf cart is operated:
 (A)  during the daytime; and
 (B)  not more than five [two] miles from the
 location where the golf cart is usually parked and for
 transportation to or from a golf course.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 551.402(b), a person may
 operate a golf cart in a master planned community described by
 Subsection (a) without a golf cart license plate on a highway for
 which the posted speed limit is not more than 35 miles per hour,
 including through an intersection of a highway for which the posted
 speed limit is more than 35 miles per hour.
 SECTION 2.  Section 551.4031, Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 551.4031.  PROHIBITION OF OPERATION ON HIGHWAY BY
 MUNICIPALITY, COUNTY, OR DEPARTMENT. (a) A county or municipality
 may prohibit the operation of a golf cart on a highway under Section
 551.403 [551.404] if the governing body of the county or
 municipality determines that the prohibition is necessary in the
 interest of safety.
 (b)  The Texas Department of Transportation may prohibit the
 operation of a golf cart on a highway under Section 551.403
 [551.404] if the department determines that the prohibition is
 necessary in the interest of safety.
 SECTION 3.  Section 551.404(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  Subsection (b) applies only to a county that:
 (1)  borders or contains a portion of the Red River; or
 (2)  [borders or contains a portion of the Guadalupe
 River and contains a part of a barrier island that] borders the Gulf
 of Mexico and has a population of less than 500,000[; or
 [(3)  is adjacent to a county described by Subdivision
 (2) and:
 [(A)  has a population of less than 37,000; and
 [(B)  contains a part of a barrier island or
 peninsula that borders the Gulf of Mexico].
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1281 was passed by the House on April
 27, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 1281 on May 27, 2021, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 1281 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1281 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays
 1; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 1281 on May 29, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor