Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1338 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/24/2021

                    H.B. No. 1338


 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation and operations of a health care
 provider participation program by the Harris County Hospital
 District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 299.004, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 299.004.  EXPIRATION. (a) Subject to Section
 299.153(d), the authority of the district to administer and operate
 a program under this chapter expires December 31, 2023 [2021].
 (b)  This chapter expires December 31, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 2.  Section 299.151(c), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  If the board requires a mandatory payment authorized
 under this chapter, the board shall set the amount of the mandatory
 payment, subject to the limitations of this chapter. The aggregate
 amount of the mandatory payments required of all paying providers
 in the district may not exceed six [four] percent of the aggregate
 net patient revenue from hospital services provided by all paying
 providers in the district.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1338 was passed by the House on April
 23, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 99, Nays 47, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1338 on May 24, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 100, Nays 43,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1338 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 19, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor