Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1401 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/06/2021

                    By: A. Johnson of Harris, et al. H.B. No. 1401
 (Senate Sponsor - Huffman)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 6, 2021;
 April 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 6, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 6, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to methods to send applications and orders for sealing
 juvenile records.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 58.256, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  An application filed under this section may be sent to
 the juvenile court by any reasonable method authorized under Rule
 21, Texas Rules of Civil Procedure, including secure electronic
 means.
 SECTION 2.  Section 58.258(c), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  On entry of the order, all adjudications relating to the
 person are vacated and the proceedings are dismissed and treated
 for all purposes as though the proceedings had never occurred.  The
 clerk of court shall:
 (1)  seal all court records relating to the
 proceedings, including any records created in the clerk's case
 management system; and
 (2)  send copies of the order to all entities listed in
 the order by any reasonable method, including certified mail or
 secure electronic means[, regular mail, or e-mail].
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *