Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1456 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                    By: Herrero (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 1456
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1456 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the expiration of the health care provider
 participation program administered and operated by the Nueces
 County Hospital District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 298C.004, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by Chapter 694 (S.B. 2315), Acts of the 86th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2019, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2, Chapter 694 (S.B. 2315), Acts of the
 86th Legislature, Regular Session, 2019, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails
 over another Act of the 87th Legislature, Regular Session, 2021,
 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
 codes.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *