Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1501 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2021

                    By: Dean, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 1501
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 19, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 22, 2021, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1501 By:  Birdwell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain regulations adopted by a governmental entity
 restricting the use of a natural gas or propane appliance or other
 system or component.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 3000, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 3000.0021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 3000.0021.  CERTAIN REGULATIONS REGARDING RESTRICTION
 OF NATURAL GAS OR PROPANE. (a)  No governmental entity may adopt or
 enforce an ordinance, resolution, regulation, code, order, policy,
 or other measure that has the purpose, intent, or effect of directly
 or indirectly banning, limiting, restricting, discriminating
 against, or prohibiting the use of an appliance or other system or
 component that is fueled by natural gas or propane in the
 construction, renovation, maintenance, or alteration of a
 residential or commercial building.
 (b)  A governmental entity may not impose any additional
 charge or pricing difference on a development or building permit
 applicant that discourages those constructing homes, buildings, or
 other structural improvements from using an appliance or other
 system or component that is fueled by natural gas or propane in the
 construction, renovation, maintenance, or alteration of a
 residential or commercial building.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *