Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1504 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/24/2021

                    By: Morales of Harris, et al. H.B. No. 1504
 (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado, West)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021;
 May 18, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 24, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 3; May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to ethnic studies instruction in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.002(a), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Each school district that offers kindergarten through
 grade 12 shall offer, as a required curriculum:
 (1)  a foundation curriculum that includes:
 (A)  English language arts;
 (B)  mathematics;
 (C)  science; and
 (D)  social studies, consisting of Texas, United
 States, and world history, government, economics, with emphasis on
 the free enterprise system and its benefits, [and] geography, and
 ethnic studies, including Mexican American and African American
 studies; and
 (2)  an enrichment curriculum that includes:
 (A)  to the extent possible, languages other than
 English;
 (B)  health, with emphasis on:
 (i)  physical health, including the
 importance of proper nutrition and exercise;
 (ii)  mental health, including instruction
 about mental health conditions, substance abuse, skills to manage
 emotions, establishing and maintaining positive relationships, and
 responsible decision-making; and
 (iii)  suicide prevention, including
 recognizing suicide-related risk factors and warning signs;
 (C)  physical education;
 (D)  fine arts;
 (E)  career and technology education;
 (F)  technology applications;
 (G)  religious literature, including the Hebrew
 Scriptures (Old Testament) and New Testament, and its impact on
 history and literature; and
 (H)  personal financial literacy.
 SECTION 2.  Section 28.025(b-1), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b-1)  The State Board of Education by rule shall require
 that the curriculum requirements for the foundation high school
 program under Subsection (a) include a requirement that students
 successfully complete:
 (1)  four credits in English language arts under
 Section 28.002(a)(1)(A), including one credit in English I, one
 credit in English II, one credit in English III, and one credit in
 an advanced English course authorized under Subsection (b-2);
 (2)  three credits in mathematics under Section
 28.002(a)(1)(B), including one credit in Algebra I, one credit in
 geometry, and one credit in any advanced mathematics course
 authorized under Subsection (b-2);
 (3)  three credits in science under Section
 28.002(a)(1)(C), including one credit in biology, one credit in any
 advanced science course authorized under Subsection (b-2), and one
 credit in integrated physics and chemistry or in an additional
 advanced science course authorized under Subsection (b-2);
 (4)  three credits in social studies under Section
 28.002(a)(1)(D), including one credit in United States history, at
 least one-half credit in government and at least one-half credit in
 economics, and one credit in ethnic studies, including Mexican
 American studies or African American studies, world geography, or
 world history;
 (5)  except as provided under Subsections (b-12),
 (b-13), and (b-14), two credits in the same language in a language
 other than English under Section 28.002(a)(2)(A);
 (6)  five elective credits;
 (7)  one credit in fine arts under Section
 28.002(a)(2)(D); and
 (8)  except as provided by Subsection (b-11), one
 credit in physical education under Section 28.002(a)(2)(C).
 SECTION 3.  Section 28.025(b-1), Education Code, as amended
 by this Act, applies only to students entering the ninth grade
 during the 2022-2023 school year or a later school year. For
 students entering a grade above ninth grade during the 2022-2023
 school year, Section 28.025(b-1), Education Code, as that section
 existed before amendment by this Act, applies, and that section is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *