By: Muñoz, Jr. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 1571 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021; April 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce; May 10, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 10, 2021, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1571 By: Hancock A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to an exemption for certain cemeteries from cemetery location restrictions. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 711.008, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Subsection (l) to read as follows: (l) Subsection (a) does not apply to a cemetery established and operating before September 1, 2023, in a municipality: (1) with a population of not less than 75,000 and not more than 95,000; and (2) in which a state veterans cemetery is located. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. * * * * *