H.B. No. 1571 AN ACT relating to an exemption for certain cemeteries from cemetery location restrictions. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 711.008, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Subsection (l) to read as follows: (l) Subsection (a) does not apply to a cemetery established and operating before September 1, 2023, in a municipality: (1) with a population of not less than 75,000 and not more than 95,000; and (2) in which a state veterans cemetery is located. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1571 was passed by the House on April 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 1, 2 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 1571 on May 20, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1571 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 17, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor