Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1664 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2021

                    By: White, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Eckhardt) H.B. No. 1664
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021;
 May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1664 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reinstatement of eligibility for medical assistance
 of certain children placed in juvenile facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 32.0264, Human Resources
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.0264.  SUSPENSION AND [AUTOMATIC] REINSTATEMENT OF
 ELIGIBILITY FOR CHILDREN IN JUVENILE FACILITIES.
 SECTION 2.  Section 32.0264, Human Resources Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), if, during the period
 a child is placed in a juvenile facility, the child is hospitalized
 or becomes an inpatient in another type of medical facility, the
 commission shall reinstate the child's eligibility for medical
 assistance during the period of the child's inpatient stay. The
 executive commissioner shall adopt rules necessary to implement
 this subsection, including rules governing the procedure for
 reinstating a child's eligibility for medical assistance under this
 subsection.
 SECTION 3.  If before implementing Section 32.0264(b-1),
 Human Resources Code, as added by this Act, the Health and Human
 Services Commission determines that a memorandum of understanding
 between the commission and the Texas Juvenile Justice Department or
 the adoption of policies or procedures is necessary for
 implementation of that provision, the commission may delay
 implementing that provision until the earlier of:
 (1)  the date any necessary memorandum of
 understanding, policies, and procedures are adopted; or
 (2)  March 1, 2022.
 SECTION 4.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *