Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1680 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/11/2021

                    By: Smith (Senate Sponsor - Springer) H.B. No. 1680
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021;
 April 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources & Economic Development; May 11, 2021, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 11, 2021, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of on-site sewage disposal systems on
 certain leased land that is owned by the federal government.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 366, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 366.006 to read as follows:
 Sec. 366.006.  CERTAIN LEASED LAND OWNED BY FEDERAL
 GOVERNMENT. (a) If a tract of land owned by the federal government
 contains separately leased individual parts, each leased part is
 considered a separate tract of land for purposes of this chapter or
 a rule adopted under this chapter.
 (b)  The commission may adopt rules as necessary to
 administer this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *