Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1693 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2021

                    By: Shaheen, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 1693
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to access to the financial responsibility verification
 program by justice and municipal courts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter N, Chapter 601, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 601.455 to read as follows:
 Sec. 601.455.  ACCESS BY COURT. (a)  A justice or municipal
 court may access the verification program established under this
 subchapter to verify financial responsibility for the purpose of
 court proceedings.
 (b)  The costs associated with accessing the verification
 program under this section shall be paid out of the county treasury
 by order of the commissioners court or the municipal treasury by
 order of the governing body of the municipality, as applicable.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *