Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1698 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                    By: Raney, Canales, Kacal H.B. No. 1698
 (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner, Hinojosa, Lucio)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2021;
 May 18, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1698 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing an optional county fee on vehicle
 registration in certain counties to be used for transportation
 projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 502.402(a) and (b), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to:
 (1)  a county that:
 (A)  borders the United Mexican States; and
 (B)  has a population of more than 250,000; [and]
 (2)  a county that has a population of more than 1.5
 million that is coterminous with a regional mobility authority; and
 (3)  a county that has a population of more than 190,000
 and not more than 1.5 million that is coterminous with a regional
 mobility authority.
 (b)  The commissioners court of a county by order may impose
 an additional fee for a vehicle registered in the county. Except as
 provided by Subsection (b-1), the fee may not exceed $10. In a
 county described by Subsection (a)(3), the fee must be approved by a
 majority of the qualified voters of the county voting on the issue
 at a referendum election, which the commissioners court may order
 and hold for that purpose.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *