Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1699 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/04/2021

                    By: Raney (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 1699
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
 April 21, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 4, 2021, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 4, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the taking of unbanded pen-reared pheasant and quail by
 certain landowners.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 42, Parks and Wildlife Code, is amended
 by adding Section 42.0211 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.0211.  TAKING OF UNBANDED PEN-REARED PHEASANT OR
 QUAIL BY CERTAIN LANDOWNERS. (a) This section applies only to:
 (1)  noncommercial activity; and
 (2)  the taking of pheasant or quail on a property of at
 least five contiguous acres.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law requiring the banding of a
 bird, a person, or the person's guest when accompanied by the
 person, may take on the person's property unbanded pen-reared
 pheasant or quail.
 (c)  Nothing in this section:
 (1)  affects the requirement to acquire a license under
 Section 45.001 for the propagation of game birds; or
 (2)  authorizes a person to:
 (A)  exceed a bag limit for pheasant or quail; or
 (B)  take pheasant or quail during a closed
 season.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *