By: Hernandez (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa, West) H.B. No. 1754 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 17, 2021; May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 24, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 24, 2021, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1754 By: Menéndez A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the inclusion of suicide prevention information on certain student identification cards issued by a public school or public institution of higher education. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter G, Chapter 38, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 38.353 to read as follows: Sec. 38.353. SUICIDE PREVENTION INFORMATION REQUIRED ON CERTAIN STUDENT IDENTIFICATION CARDS. Each student identification card issued by a public school to a student in grade six or higher: (1) must have printed on either side of the card the telephone number for: (A) the National Suicide Prevention Lifeline; and (B) the Crisis Text Line; and (2) may have printed on either side of the card the telephone number for a local suicide prevention hotline, if available. SECTION 2. Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 51.91941 to read as follows: Sec. 51.91941. SUICIDE PREVENTION INFORMATION REQUIRED ON STUDENT IDENTIFICATION CARD. (a) In this section, "institution of higher education" has the meaning assigned by Section 61.003. (b) Each student identification card issued by an institution of higher education: (1) must have printed on either side of the card the telephone number for: (A) the National Suicide Prevention Lifeline; (B) the Crisis Text Line; and (C) the campus police department or security for the campus at which the student to whom the card is issued regularly attends classes or, if the campus does not have a campus police department or security, a local nonemergency police contact; and (2) may have printed on either side of the card the telephone number for a local suicide prevention hotline, if available. SECTION 3. (a) Notwithstanding Sections 38.353 and 51.91941, Education Code, as added by this Act, if, on January 1, 2022, a public school or a public institution of higher education subject to the requirements of Section 38.353 or 51.91941, Education Code, as applicable, has a supply of unissued student identification cards that do not comply with the applicable requirements of those sections, the public school or public institution of higher education may issue those student identification cards until the supply of cards is depleted. (b) Sections 38.353 and 51.91941, Education Code, as added by this Act, apply only to an initial or replacement student identification card issued on or after June 1, 2022. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021. * * * * *