Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1787 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2021

                    By: Lambert (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 1787
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021;
 April 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; April 23, 2021, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 23, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to liability coverage under a personal automobile
 insurance policy for a temporary vehicle provided to an insured by
 an automobile repair facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1952.060(d), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (d)  The coverage required by this section provides primary
 coverage for the insured's legal liability for bodily injury and
 property damage and for damage to the temporary vehicle, not excess
 coverage. The coverage must insure:
 (1)  the person named in the personal automobile
 insurance policy; and
 (2)  any resident relative of the insured and licensed
 operator residing in the household except for a person specifically
 named in a named driver exclusion under Section 1952.353(b) [an
 individual not covered in a "named driver policy" under Section
 1952.0545].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *