Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1788 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2021

                    By: Hefner (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 1788
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 19, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 4; May 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to immunity from liability of public and private schools
 and security personnel employed by those schools for certain
 actions of security personnel.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 37, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 37.087 to read as follows:
 Sec. 37.087.  IMMUNITY FROM LIABILITY. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Retired peace officer" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 1701.3161, Occupations Code.
 (2)  "Security personnel" includes:
 (A)  a school district peace officer;
 (B)  a school marshal;
 (C)  a school resource officer; and
 (D)  a retired peace officer who:
 (i)  has been hired by a school district,
 open-enrollment charter school, or private school to provide
 security services; or
 (ii)  volunteers to provide security
 services to the school district, open-enrollment charter school, or
 private school.
 (b)  A school district, open-enrollment charter school, or
 private school is immune from liability for any damages resulting
 from any reasonable action taken by security personnel to maintain
 the safety of the school campus, including action relating to
 possession or use of a firearm.
 (c)  A school district, open-enrollment charter school, or
 private school is immune from liability as provided by Subsection
 (b) for any damages resulting from any reasonable action taken by a
 school district, open-enrollment charter school, or private school
 employee who has written permission from the board of trustees of
 the school district or the governing body of the open-enrollment
 charter school or the private school to carry a firearm on campus.
 (d)  Any security personnel employed by a school district,
 open-enrollment charter school, or private school is immune from
 liability for any damages resulting from any reasonable action
 taken by the security personnel to maintain the safety of the school
 campus, including action relating to possession or use of a
 firearm.
 (e)  The statutory immunity provided by this section is in
 addition to and does not preempt the common law doctrine of official
 and governmental immunity. To the extent that another statute
 provides greater immunity to a school district, open-enrollment
 charter school, or private school than this section, that statute
 prevails.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2021-2022
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *