Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB180 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2021

                    By: González of El Paso (Senate Sponsor - Blanco) H.B. No. 180
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021;
 April 19, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 13, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 13, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of vacation leave time to a sick leave pool
 in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 157.072(b), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The commissioners court of a county with a population of
 800,000 [one million] or more may allow an employee to voluntarily
 transfer vacation leave time earned by the employee to a county sick
 leave pool.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *