Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1800 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/10/2021

                    87R4714 KFF-D
 By: Lopez H.B. No. 1800


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a pilot program to establish community collaboratives
 to address financial exploitation of elderly persons in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITIONS. In this Act:
 (1)  "Community collaborative" means a community
 collaborative established under the pilot program.
 (2)  "Department" means the Department of Family and
 Protective Services.
 (3)  "Financial exploitation" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 281.001, Finance Code.
 (4)  "Pilot program" means the pilot program
 established under Section 2 of this Act.
 SECTION 2.  PILOT PROGRAM TO ESTABLISH COMMUNITY
 COLLABORATIVES TO ADDRESS FINANCIAL EXPLOITATION OF ELDERLY
 PERSONS. (a)  Not later than December 1, 2021, the department shall
 develop and implement a pilot program to establish community
 collaboratives under which entities with an interest in preventing
 financial exploitation of elderly persons collaborate to help
 prevent, protect against, and prosecute that exploitation and
 otherwise improve the financial security of elderly persons. To
 the extent possible, each community collaborative should include
 the following entities as participants:
 (1)  at least one social service agency or other entity
 capable of providing services to the community aimed at preventing
 financial exploitation, including financial counseling, benefits
 assistance, insurance counseling, presentations and other
 educational information on scams, fraud, and identity theft
 targeted at elderly persons, and money management and employment
 services;
 (2)  at least one local court with jurisdiction over
 guardianship proceedings; and
 (3)  the office of at least one prosecuting attorney in
 the community that has an independent unit committed to
 investigating and prosecuting financial exploitation.
 (b)  In developing and implementing the pilot program, the
 department shall:
 (1)  consult with the Elder Financial Safety Center or
 another entity familiar with designing and maintaining similar
 community collaboratives; and
 (2)  establish the collaboratives in at least five
 different geographical areas of this state that are representative
 of diverse communities with different resources and services to
 evaluate how the collaborative model can be adapted to different
 communities.
 SECTION 3.  REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2022, the
 department shall prepare and submit a report to the governor,
 lieutenant governor, and each member of the legislature that
 includes:
 (1)  a description and summary of the pilot program,
 including a description of where each community collaborative was
 established and the entities participating in each collaborative;
 (2)  the department's evaluation of the effect of each
 collaborative in the community in which it was implemented; and
 (3)  a recommendation as to whether the community
 collaboratives should be continued or terminated.
 SECTION 4.  EXPIRATION. The pilot program terminates and
 this Act expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 5.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021.