Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1869 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2021

                    By: Burrows, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt) H.B. No. 1869
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 2;
 May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1869 By:  Bettencourt


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of debt for the purposes of calculating
 certain ad valorem tax rates of a taxing unit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 26.012, Tax Code, is amended by amending
 Subdivision (7) and adding Subdivisions (9), (18-a), and (18-b) to
 read as follows:
 (7)  "Debt" means:
 (A)  a bond, warrant, certificate of obligation,
 or other evidence of indebtedness owed by a taxing unit that:
 (i)  is payable [solely] from property taxes
 in installments over a period of more than one year, not budgeted
 for payment from maintenance and operations funds, and secured by a
 pledge of property taxes; and
 (ii)  meets one of the following
 requirements:
 (a)  has been approved at an election;
 (b)  includes self-supporting debt;
 (c)  evidences a loan under a state or
 federal financial assistance program;
 (d)  is issued for designated
 infrastructure;
 (e)  is a refunding bond;
 (f)  is issued in response to an
 emergency under Section 1431.015, Government Code;
 (g)  is issued for renovating,
 improving, or equipping existing buildings or facilities;
 (h)  is issued for vehicles or
 equipment; or
 (i)  is issued for a project under
 Chapter 311, Tax Code, or Chapter 222, Transportation Code, that is
 located in a reinvestment zone created under one of those
 chapters;[,] or
 (B)  a payment made under contract to secure
 indebtedness of a similar nature issued by another political
 subdivision on behalf of the taxing unit.
 (9)  "Designated infrastructure" means infrastructure,
 including a facility, equipment, rights-of-way, or land, for the
 following purposes:
 (A)  streets, roads, highways, bridges,
 sidewalks, parks, landfills, or airports;
 (B)  telecommunications, wireless
 communications, information technology systems, applications,
 hardware, or software;
 (C)  cybersecurity;
 (D)  as part of any utility system, water supply
 project, water plant, wastewater plant, water and wastewater
 distribution or conveyance facility, wharf, dock, or flood control
 and drainage project;
 (E)  as part of any school district;
 (F)  as part of any hospital district created by
 general or special law that includes a teaching hospital; or
 (G)  police stations, fire stations, or other
 public safety facilities, jails, juvenile detention facilities, or
 judicial facilities.
 (18-a)  "Refunding bond" means a bond or other
 obligation issued for refunding or refinancing purposes under
 Chapter 1207 or 1371, Government Code.
 (18-b)  "Self-supporting debt" means the portion of a
 bond, warrant, certificate of obligation, or other evidence of
 indebtedness described by Subdivision (7)(A)(i) designated by the
 governing body of a political subdivision as being repaid from a
 source other than property taxes.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a bond, warrant, certificate of obligation, or other evidence of
 indebtedness for which the ordinance, order, or resolution
 authorizing issuance was adopted by the governing body of the
 taxing unit on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *