Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1894 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/12/2021

                    87R4999 MCF-D
 By: White H.B. No. 1894


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a clemency review of certain felony offenders by the
 Board of Pardons and Paroles.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 48, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 48.015 to read as follows:
 Art. 48.015.  CLEMENCY REVIEW FOR CERTAIN FELONIES. (a) In
 this article, "board" means the Board of Pardons and Paroles.
 (b)  The board shall review each person described by
 Subsection (c) to identify appropriate persons to recommend to the
 governor for purposes of granting clemency.
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (d), a person is
 entitled to review under this article if:
 (1)  the person was convicted of or placed on deferred
 adjudication community supervision for a state jail felony or a
 felony of the third degree;
 (2)  a period of not less than 20 years has elapsed from
 the date, as applicable:
 (A)  the person's sentence for the offense
 described by Subdivision (1) was finally discharged; or
 (B)  the person received a dismissal and discharge
 under Article 42A.111 for the offense described by Subdivision (1);
 and
 (3)  during the period described by Subdivision (2),
 the person has not been convicted of any offense other than an
 offense punishable by fine only.
 (d)  The board may exclude from the review required by this
 article persons described by Subsection (c) who were convicted of
 or placed on deferred adjudication for certain offenses for which
 the board considers clemency inappropriate, such as:
 (1)  sexual offenses;
 (2)  offenses involving family violence, as defined by
 Section 71.004, Family Code; or
 (3)  offenses involving a victim who was a child, an
 elderly individual, or a disabled individual at the time of the
 offense.
 (e)  The board shall develop a plan to implement the review
 required by this article.  The plan must require that, not later
 than:
 (1)  September 1, 2028, the board review the state jail
 felony convictions of persons entitled to review under this article
 as of September 1, 2021;
 (2)  September 1, 2035, the board review the third
 degree felony convictions of persons entitled to review under this
 article as of September 1, 2028; and
 (3)  September 1, 2042, the board review the deferred
 adjudication community supervision of persons entitled to review
 under this article as of September 1, 2035.
 (f)  This subsection and Subsection (e) expire September 1,
 2043.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.