Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1936 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2021

                    By: Bucy, Burns, Price H.B. No. 1936
 (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021;
 April 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 10, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 10, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates to honor
 members of the United States Army Special Forces.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.202(e-1), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e-1)  Other than license plates issued under Subsection
 (h), license plates issued under this section may include, on
 request:
 (1)  the emblem of the veteran's branch of service; or
 (2)  one emblem from another license plate to which the
 person is entitled under Section 504.308, 504.309, 504.310(b),
 504.311, 504.312, 504.313, 504.3135, 504.314, 504.315, 504.316,
 504.3161, 504.318, 504.319, 504.320, 504.323, [as added by Chapter
 1085 (H.B. 3567), Acts of the 85th Legislature, Regular Session,
 2017, or] 504.325, or 504.327.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.327 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.327.  UNITED STATES ARMY SPECIAL FORCES. The
 department shall issue specialty license plates for persons who
 serve or have served in the United States armed services and have
 earned Special Forces qualifications.  The license plates must
 include:
 (1)  the words "Army Special Forces"; and
 (2)  a depiction of the United States Army Special
 Forces shoulder sleeve insignia with the Special Forces Tab.
 SECTION 3.  To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails
 over another Act of the 87th Legislature, Regular Session, 2021,
 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
 codes.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *