Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1964 Fiscal Note / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/23/2021

                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 87TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             March 23, 2021       TO: Honorable Angie Chen Button, Chair, House Committee on International Relations & Economic Development     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB1964 by Lopez (Relating to a study on the cost of providing quality child care in this state in comparison to family income.), As Introduced     Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1964, As Introduced : an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2023. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2022$02023$02024$02025$02026$0All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable (Cost) fromWorkforce Commission Federal Acct50262022($875,000)2023$02024($875,000)2025$02026$0 Fiscal AnalysisThe bill would amend Chapter 301 of the Labor Code requiring the Texas Workforce Commission (TWC) to conduct a study regarding the cost, in comparison to family income, of providing child care that meets at least the Texas Rising Star 3-Star certification requirements.  The bill would require that no later than December 15, 2022, TWC report the results of the study to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and each legislative committee with jurisdiction over child care facilities. The bill would require that TWC update the study results and submit the updated results no later than December 15, 2024.

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 87TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 23, 2021

 

 

  TO: Honorable Angie Chen Button, Chair, House Committee on International Relations & Economic Development     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB1964 by Lopez (Relating to a study on the cost of providing quality child care in this state in comparison to family income.), As Introduced   

TO: Honorable Angie Chen Button, Chair, House Committee on International Relations & Economic Development
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1964 by Lopez (Relating to a study on the cost of providing quality child care in this state in comparison to family income.), As Introduced

 Honorable Angie Chen Button, Chair, House Committee on International Relations & Economic Development

 Honorable Angie Chen Button, Chair, House Committee on International Relations & Economic Development

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 HB1964 by Lopez (Relating to a study on the cost of providing quality child care in this state in comparison to family income.), As Introduced 

 HB1964 by Lopez (Relating to a study on the cost of providing quality child care in this state in comparison to family income.), As Introduced 



Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1964, As Introduced : an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2023. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1964, As Introduced : an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2023. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: 


2022 $0
2023 $0
2024 $0
2025 $0
2026 $0

All Funds, Five-Year Impact: 


2022 ($875,000)
2023 $0
2024 ($875,000)
2025 $0
2026 $0

 Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend Chapter 301 of the Labor Code requiring the Texas Workforce Commission (TWC) to conduct a study regarding the cost, in comparison to family income, of providing child care that meets at least the Texas Rising Star 3-Star certification requirements.  The bill would require that no later than December 15, 2022, TWC report the results of the study to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and each legislative committee with jurisdiction over child care facilities. The bill would require that TWC update the study results and submit the updated results no later than December 15, 2024.

The bill would amend Chapter 301 of the Labor Code requiring the Texas Workforce Commission (TWC) to conduct a study regarding the cost, in comparison to family income, of providing child care that meets at least the Texas Rising Star 3-Star certification requirements.  



The bill would require that no later than December 15, 2022, TWC report the results of the study to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and each legislative committee with jurisdiction over child care facilities. The bill would require that TWC update the study results and submit the updated results no later than December 15, 2024.

 Methodology

According to TWC, in June 2019, the agency contracted with the University of Texas, Texas Institute for Child and Family Wellbeing (TICFW) to conduct a study of the cost of providing higher-quality care under the Texas Rising Star program. The study is due in the spring of 2021, with a supplemental and final report due in the Spring of 2022. The TICFW study includes all the elements required by the bill except the facility's operating costs, including any rent or mortgage, utility expenses, insurance, and building maintenance; and the license fees needed to operate the facility.Since the scope of the required report is similar to the scope of the TICFW study currently being conducted, TWC assumes that the cost of each of the studies required by the bill would be equal to the cost of the current study, which is $875,000. This analysis assumes TWC would contract to conduct the report as required by this legislation for $875,000 in fiscal year 2022 and $875,000 in fiscal year 2024 from Federal Funds.

According to TWC, in June 2019, the agency contracted with the University of Texas, Texas Institute for Child and Family Wellbeing (TICFW) to conduct a study of the cost of providing higher-quality care under the Texas Rising Star program. The study is due in the spring of 2021, with a supplemental and final report due in the Spring of 2022. The TICFW study includes all the elements required by the bill except the facility's operating costs, including any rent or mortgage, utility expenses, insurance, and building maintenance; and the license fees needed to operate the facility.



Since the scope of the required report is similar to the scope of the TICFW study currently being conducted, TWC assumes that the cost of each of the studies required by the bill would be equal to the cost of the current study, which is $875,000. This analysis assumes TWC would contract to conduct the report as required by this legislation for $875,000 in fiscal year 2022 and $875,000 in fiscal year 2024 from Federal Funds.

 Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 320 Texas Workforce Commission

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 320 Texas Workforce Commission

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, SZ, MB, DFR

JMc, SZ, MB, DFR