Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1971 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/22/2021

                    87R2343 BDP-D
 By: Canales H.B. No. 1971


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the purchase and installation of climate control
 systems at facilities operated by the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this section, "department" means the
 Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
 (b)  The department shall:
 (1)  contract with a private entity through a
 competitive bidding process to purchase and install climate control
 systems at each facility operated by the department that is not
 currently equipped with a climate control system capable of
 maintaining the temperature in the facility at not less than 65
 degrees Fahrenheit or more than 85 degrees Fahrenheit; and
 (2)  install the climate control systems in the
 following phases, with each phase consisting of the installation of
 climate control systems at approximately one-third of the
 department's facilities at a cost not to exceed $100 million per
 phase:
 (A)  phase one to be completed not later than
 December 31, 2024;
 (B)  phase two to be completed not later than
 December 31, 2026; and
 (C)  phase three to be completed not later than
 December 31, 2028.
 (c)  In conducting the competitive bidding process, the
 department shall solicit bids for the entire scope of the project,
 provided that the department may solicit bids for each phase of the
 project if necessary or beneficial.
 (d)  In soliciting bids and determining the requirements for
 the phased implementation of the project, the department shall:
 (1)  prioritize the efficient use of state resources;
 and
 (2)  consider factors such as:
 (A)  the type of climate control systems needed
 for each facility, including the architectural design of each
 facility;
 (B)  the ability of any existing climate control
 systems in each facility to maintain the air temperature in the
 facility at not less than 65 degrees Fahrenheit or more than 85
 degrees Fahrenheit;
 (C)  the comparable abilities of different
 climate control systems to maintain the temperature described by
 Paragraph (B) of this subdivision, including the total cellblock or
 dormitory square footage each system is capable of maintaining at
 that temperature; and
 (D)  the use of inmate labor to decrease costs.
 SECTION 2.  This Act expires January 1, 2031.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.