Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1987 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/31/2021

                    H.B. No. 1987


 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility requirements to hold a political party
 office.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 161.005, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (c) and adding Subsection (a-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  To be eligible to be a candidate for or to serve as an
 officer [a county or precinct chair] of a political party, a person
 must:
 (1)  [be a qualified voter of the county; and
 [(2)]  except as provided by Subsection (c), not be a
 candidate for nomination or election to, or be the holder of, an
 elective office of the federal, state, or county government; and
 (2)  if the office is a county or precinct chair of a
 political party, be a qualified voter of the county.
 (a-1)  For purposes of this section, the following are
 officers of a political party:
 (1)  a precinct chair;
 (2)  a county chair; and
 (3)  a member, a chair, or a vice chair of a state
 executive committee of a political party.
 (c)  A candidate for nomination or election to, or the holder
 of, an elective office of the federal, state, or county government
 is eligible to serve as an officer [a county or precinct chair] of a
 political party to which Chapter 181 applies.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1987 was passed by the House on May
 11, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 103, Nays 42, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No.
 1987 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 99, Nays 18, 13
 present, not voting; and that the House adopted H.C.R. No. 119
 authorizing certain corrections in H.B. No. 1987 on May 31, 2021, by
 the following vote: Yeas 132, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1987 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; and that the Senate adopted H.C.R. No. 119 authorizing certain
 corrections in H.B. No. 1987 on May 31, 2021, by the following vote:
 Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor