Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2045 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/22/2021

                    87R3549 JG-D
 By: Lopez H.B. No. 2045


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a task force to evaluate the housing
 needs of senior citizens who are lesbian, gay, bisexual,
 transgender, queer, or questioning.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this section, "task force" means the task
 force established under this section.
 (b)  The task force is established to evaluate the housing
 needs of senior citizens who are lesbian, gay, bisexual,
 transgender, queer, or questioning and to develop potential housing
 solutions to address those needs and provide to those senior
 citizens safe, affordable housing options. In conducting the
 evaluation, the task force shall assess the evolving housing needs
 of senior citizens who may need to transition into a long-term care
 facility, including an assisted living facility or a nursing
 facility.
 (c)  The task force is composed of the following 10 members:
 (1)  the chair of the LGBTQ caucus of the house of
 representatives, to serve as presiding officer of the task force;
 and
 (2)  nine members appointed by the governor as follows:
 (A)  three appropriately qualified individuals
 who are representatives of the lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender,
 queer, or questioning community;
 (B)  three individuals with appropriate expertise
 on issues faced by the aging population, which may include
 representatives of the Coalition for Aging LGBT, assisted living
 facilities, or nursing facilities; and
 (C)  three individuals with appropriate expertise
 in the area of public safety and housing, which may include one or
 more representatives of the Texas Department of Housing and
 Community Affairs.
 (d)  In making the appointments under Subsection (c) of this
 section, the governor shall seek input from appropriately qualified
 organizations and stakeholders, including the Coalition for Aging
 LGBT and Equality Texas.
 (e)  The governor shall make the appointments required by
 Subsection (c) of this section not later than November 1, 2021.
 (f)  The task force shall meet at the call of the presiding
 officer. The task force may meet in person or by electronic means.
 (g)  A task force member is not entitled to compensation for
 service on the task force but may be reimbursed for actual and
 necessary expenses incurred in performing task force duties. The
 task force may accept gifts, grants, and donations to pay for those
 expenses.
 (h)  Not later than September 1, 2022, the task force shall
 prepare and submit to the governor, the legislature, and the Texas
 Department of Housing and Community Affairs a written report
 summarizing the results of the evaluation conducted under
 Subsection (b) of this section and proposing potential housing
 solutions, including any legislative recommendations.
 (i)  The task force is abolished and this Act expires
 December 1, 2022.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.