Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2064 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2021

                    By: Leach (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 2064
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 11, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 1;
 May 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2064 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the amount of a hospital or physician lien on certain
 causes of action or claims.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 55.004(b), Property Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  A hospital lien described by Section 55.002(a) is for
 the lesser of:
 (1)  the amount of the hospital's charges for services
 provided to the injured individual during the first 100 days of the
 injured individual's hospitalization; [or]
 (2)  50 percent of all amounts recovered by the injured
 individual through a cause of action, judgment, or settlement
 described by Section 55.003(a); or
 (3)  if the trier of fact specifies the amount awarded
 for hospital charges for services provided to the injured
 individual, the amount awarded by the trier of fact for the services
 provided to the injured individual by the hospital less the pro rata
 share of reasonable attorney's fees and expenses the injured
 individual incurred in pursing the claim.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a lien for services provided to an injured individual on or after
 the effective date of this Act.  A lien for services provided before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *