Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2086 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2021

                    By: Morales of Maverick (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 2086
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to appeals from an interlocutory order denying a motion
 for summary judgment by certain contractors.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.014(a), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person may appeal from an interlocutory order of a
 district court, county court at law, statutory probate court, or
 county court that:
 (1)  appoints a receiver or trustee;
 (2)  overrules a motion to vacate an order that
 appoints a receiver or trustee;
 (3)  certifies or refuses to certify a class in a suit
 brought under Rule 42 of the Texas Rules of Civil Procedure;
 (4)  grants or refuses a temporary injunction or grants
 or overrules a motion to dissolve a temporary injunction as
 provided by Chapter 65;
 (5)  denies a motion for summary judgment that is based
 on an assertion of immunity by an individual who is an officer or
 employee of the state or a political subdivision of the state;
 (6)  denies a motion for summary judgment that is based
 in whole or in part upon a claim against or defense by a member of
 the electronic or print media, acting in such capacity, or a person
 whose communication appears in or is published by the electronic or
 print media, arising under the free speech or free press clause of
 the First Amendment to the United States Constitution, or Article
 I, Section 8, of the Texas Constitution, or Chapter 73;
 (7)  grants or denies the special appearance of a
 defendant under Rule 120a, Texas Rules of Civil Procedure, except
 in a suit brought under the Family Code;
 (8)  grants or denies a plea to the jurisdiction by a
 governmental unit as that term is defined in Section 101.001;
 (9)  denies all or part of the relief sought by a motion
 under Section 74.351(b), except that an appeal may not be taken from
 an order granting an extension under Section 74.351;
 (10)  grants relief sought by a motion under Section
 74.351(l);
 (11)  denies a motion to dismiss filed under Section
 90.007;
 (12)  denies a motion to dismiss filed under Section
 27.003;
 (13)  denies a motion for summary judgment filed by an
 electric utility regarding liability in a suit subject to Section
 75.0022; [or]
 (14)  denies a motion filed by a municipality with a
 population of 500,000 or more in an action filed under Section
 54.012(6) or 214.0012, Local Government Code; or
 (15)  denies a motion for summary judgment filed by a
 contractor based on Section 97.002.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *