Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB21 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                    By: Neave, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 21
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 21, 2021, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the statute of limitations applicable to a sexual
 harassment complaint filed with the Texas Workforce Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.201(g), Labor Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (g)  If a perfected complaint is not received by the
 commission within 180 days of the alleged unlawful employment
 practice or, for a complaint alleging sexual harassment, within 300
 days of the alleged sexual harassment, the commission shall notify
 the respondent that a complaint has been filed and that the process
 of perfecting the complaint is in progress.
 SECTION 2.  Section 21.202, Labor Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (a-1), a [A] complaint
 under this subchapter must be filed not later than the 180th day
 after the date the alleged unlawful employment practice occurred.
 (a-1)  A complaint under this subchapter alleging sexual
 harassment must be filed not later than the 300th day after the date
 the alleged sexual harassment occurred.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a sexual harassment complaint based on conduct occurring on or
 after the effective date of this Act. A sexual harassment complaint
 that is based on conduct occurring before that date is governed by
 the law in effect on the date the conduct occurred, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *