Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2127 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2021

                    By: Turner of Tarrant, et al. H.B. No. 2127
 (Senate Sponsor - Hancock)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021;
 April 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 10, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 10, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to consumption of alcoholic beverages in public
 entertainment facilities and zones.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 108.73, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivision (3-a) to read as follows:
 (3-a)  "Public entertainment zone" means an area of
 land that:
 (A)  is owned by a municipality with a population
 of 175,000 or more;
 (B)  is designated as a public entertainment zone
 by the governing body of a municipality in a formal meeting; and
 (C)  contains a public safety facility.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 108.82, Alcoholic
 Beverage Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 108.82.  ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE CONSUMPTION IN PUBLIC
 ENTERTAINMENT FACILITIES AND ZONES.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 108.82(a) and (b), Alcoholic Beverage
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to [a public entertainment
 facility]:
 (1)  a public entertainment facility that is owned or
 leased by the Texas State Railroad Authority and used as a station
 for passenger rail services; [or]
 (2)  a public entertainment facility that is a stadium,
 arena, or other permanent structure that is used for sporting
 events and:
 (A)  relating to which an agreement approved by
 the administrator under Section 108.79 is in force; and
 (B)  for which all alcoholic beverage permits and
 licenses are held by a single holder; or
 (3)  a public entertainment zone.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 28.10, the concessionaire for a
 public entertainment facility or a public entertainment zone
 described by Subsection (a) may allow a patron who possesses an
 alcoholic beverage to enter or leave a licensed or permitted
 premises within the facility or zone if the alcoholic beverage:
 (1)  is in an open container, as defined by Section
 49.031, Penal Code;
 (2)  appears to be possessed for present consumption;
 (3)  except as provided by Section 48.01(b), remains
 within the confines of the facility or zone, excluding a parking
 lot; and
 (4)  was purchased legally at a licensed or permitted
 premises within the facility or zone.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *