Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2168 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/24/2021

                    By: Krause, Bucy (Senate Sponsor - Powell) H.B. No. 2168
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2021;
 May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 24, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2;
 May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2168 By:  Powell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the repeal of a criminal offense for certain charitable
 raffle ticket sales by professional sports team charitable
 foundations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 2004.002(1-a) and 2004.009(a),
 Occupations Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 2.  The repeal by this Act of Section 2004.009(a),
 Occupations Code, does not apply to an offense committed under that
 section before the effective date of the repeal. An offense
 committed before the effective date of the repeal is governed by the
 law as it existed on the date the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 the repeal if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *