Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2201 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2021

                    By: Ashby, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 2201
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 19, 2021, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the location of pits used in the production of oil and
 gas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 91, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 91.1017 to read as follows:
 Sec. 91.1017.  LOCATION OF CERTAIN PITS. The commission by
 rule shall establish standards governing permissible locations for
 pits used by commercial oil and gas disposal facilities. The rules
 must include a history of flooding in the 10 years preceding the
 construction of the pit as a factor in determining whether a
 proposed location of a pit is permissible.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *