Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2205 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                    By: Romero, Jr., Holland, Toth H.B. No. 2205
 (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2205 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to applicability of the International Swimming Pool and
 Spa Code to certain pools, spas, and other swimming areas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 341.0645, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (c), (d),
 (e), (f), and (g) to read as follows:
 (b)  The executive commissioner shall adopt by rule pool
 safety standards necessary to prevent drowning. The standards must:
 (1)  be at least as stringent as those imposed under the
 federal Virginia Graeme Baker Pool and Spa Safety Act (15 U.S.C.
 Section 8001 et seq.); and
 (2)  comply with and adopt by reference a version of the
 International Swimming Pool and Spa Code, as defined by Section
 214.103, Local Government Code, that is not older than the version
 in effect on May 1, 2019, regarding all construction, alteration,
 renovation, enlargement, and repair of commercial swimming pools
 and spas.
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), the department is not
 required to adopt Chapter 1 of the International Swimming Pool and
 Spa Code.
 (d)  Subsection (b) does not affect requirements for pool
 yard enclosure imposed under Chapter 757.
 (e)  The executive commissioner by rule shall authorize a
 minor addition, alteration, renovation, or repair to an existing
 pool or spa and related mechanical, electrical, and plumbing
 systems in the same manner and arrangement as the executive
 commissioner authorized the construction of the pool or spa and
 related mechanical, electrical, and plumbing systems.
 (f)  A person may use, maintain, and repair a pool or spa that
 was in compliance with the laws of this state on August 31, 2021,
 and related mechanical, electrical, and plumbing systems in
 accordance with the laws applicable to the pool or system on that
 date.
 (g)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b)(2), this section does
 not affect the authority of the executive commissioner to adopt
 rules regarding pool operation and management, water quality,
 safety standards unrelated to design and construction, signage, and
 enclosures.
 SECTION 2.  Section 214.103, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to
 read as follows:
 (b)  To protect the public health, safety, and welfare, the
 International Swimming Pool and Spa Code, as it existed on May 1,
 2019, is adopted as the municipal swimming pool and spa code in this
 state. A municipality may adopt a more recent version of the
 International Swimming Pool and Spa Code to apply in the
 municipality.
 (b-1)  To the extent a provision of a code adopted by a
 municipality under Subsection (b) conflicts with a law of this
 state or a regulation on pool operation and management, water
 quality, safety standards unrelated to design and construction,
 signage, or enclosures, the law or regulation controls.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *