Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2238 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2021

                    By: Krause (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 2238
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2021, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice prohibiting hunting on or over certain submerged
 land.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 62.0061(a), Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), a person may not
 hunt or take any wild animal or wild bird when the person is on or
 over privately owned land that is:
 (1)  submerged under:
 (A)  public fresh water due to seasonal or
 occasional innundation; or
 (B)  public salt water and located above the mean
 high tide line of the Gulf of Mexico and its bays and estuaries; and
 (2)  conspicuously marked as privately owned by:
 (A)  a vertical purple line, at least eight inches
 in length and one inch in width, painted on trees or posts on the
 property so as to be readily visible to a person accessing the
 property when the property is submerged by water; or
 (B)  a sign or signs that are substantially
 similar to the following:
 POSTED.  PRIVATE PROPERTY.  NO HUNTING.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *