Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2283 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    By: King of Parker, et al. H.B. No. 2283
 (Senate Sponsor - Creighton)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 20, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 2;
 May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2283 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prohibition of certain contributions and donations
 for the administration of elections.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 31, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 31.126 to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.126.  PROHIBITED CONTRIBUTIONS. (a) Without the
 written consent of the secretary of state, the joint elections
 commission, county election commission, and county election board
 may not:
 (1)  accept a contribution of $1,000 or more, including
 the value of in-kind donations, offered by:
 (A)  a private individual;
 (B)  a business entity, including a:
 (i)  corporation;
 (ii)  partnership; or
 (iii)  trust; or
 (C)  another third party; or
 (2)  use a contribution described by Subdivision (1) to
 perform a function of administering elections.
 (b)  The secretary of state may grant consent under
 Subsection (a) only if:
 (1)  the secretary consults with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives on the proposed donation; and
 (2)  the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the
 speaker of the house of representatives unanimously agree to the
 secretary's grant of consent.
 (c)  The joint elections commission, county election
 commission, and county election board may accept a contribution of
 less than $1,000 only with written consent from the relevant
 political subdivision.
 (d)  This section does not prohibit the acceptance of:
 (1)  an in-kind contribution of food or beverage for
 election workers during the administration of an election;
 (2)  any state or federal funds administered or
 distributed by the secretary of state, including funds administered
 and distributed under Section 31.009, or other state or federal
 funds made available to political subdivisions to perform a
 function related to elections; or
 (3)  an offer for use, without charge or for a reduced
 fee, of a public or private building or a portion of a building for
 the purposes of conducting an election, including for use as a
 polling place designated under Chapter 43.
 SECTION 2.  Section 81.032, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 81.032.  ACCEPTANCE OF DONATIONS AND BEQUESTS. (a) The
 commissioners court may accept a donation of labor or services,
 gift, grant, donation, bequest, or devise of money or other
 property on behalf of the county, including a donation under
 Chapter 38, Government Code, for the purpose of performing a
 function conferred by law on the county or a county officer.
 (b)  The commissioners court may not accept a donation
 described in Subsection (a) of over $1,000 for use in administering
 elections without the written consent of the secretary of state.
 (c)  The secretary of state may grant consent under
 Subsection (b) only if:
 (1)  the secretary consults with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives on the proposed donation; and
 (2)  the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the
 speaker of the house of representatives unanimously agree to the
 secretary's grant of consent.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *