Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2301 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/14/2021

                    By: Parker, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 2301
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 11, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 14, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 14, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a change of name for participants in the address
 confidentiality program administered by the office of the attorney
 general.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 45.102, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  A petitioner is not required to provide the street
 address of the petitioner's place of residence or the petitioner's
 reason for the requested change of name as otherwise required by
 Subsection (a) if the petitioner provides a copy of an
 authorization card certifying in accordance with Article 58.059,
 Code of Criminal Procedure, that the petitioner is a participant in
 the address confidentiality program administered by the attorney
 general under Subchapter B, Chapter 58, Code of Criminal Procedure.
 SECTION 2.  Section 45.103, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (a-1) and (c-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  For purposes of Subsection (a), it is presumed that a
 change of name is in the interest or to the benefit of the
 petitioner and in the interest of the public if the petitioner
 provides a copy of an authorization card certifying in accordance
 with Article 58.059, Code of Criminal Procedure, that the
 petitioner is a participant in the address confidentiality program
 administered by the attorney general under Subchapter B, Chapter
 58, Code of Criminal Procedure.
 (c-1)  An order issued under this section to change the name
 of a petitioner described by Subsection (a-1) is confidential and
 may not be released by the court to any person, regardless of
 whether the petitioner continues to participate in the address
 confidentiality program following the change of name under this
 subchapter.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a petition for a change of name that is submitted on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *