Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2315 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    By: Turner of Dallas, et al. H.B. No. 2315
 (Senate Sponsor - Huffman)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 28, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the forfeiture of contraband relating to the criminal
 offense of racing on a highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) Article 59.01(2), Code of Criminal
 Procedure, as effective until January 1, 2022, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (2)  "Contraband" means property of any nature,
 including real, personal, tangible, or intangible, that is:
 (A)  used in the commission of:
 (i)  any first or second degree felony under
 the Penal Code;
 (ii)  any felony under Section 15.031(b),
 21.11, or 38.04 or Chapter 29, 30, 31, 32, 33, 33A, or 35, Penal
 Code;
 (iii)  any felony under Chapter 43, Penal
 Code, except as provided by Paragraph (B);
 (iv)  any felony under The Securities Act
 (Article 581-1 et seq., Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes); or
 (v)  any offense under Chapter 49, Penal
 Code, that is punishable as a felony of the third degree or state
 jail felony, if the defendant has been previously convicted three
 times of an offense under that chapter;
 (B)  used or intended to be used in the commission
 of:
 (i)  any felony under Chapter 481, Health
 and Safety Code (Texas Controlled Substances Act);
 (ii)  any felony under Chapter 483, Health
 and Safety Code;
 (iii)  a felony under Chapter 151, Finance
 Code;
 (iv)  any felony under Chapter 20A or 34,
 Penal Code;
 (v)  a Class A misdemeanor under Subchapter
 B, Chapter 365, Health and Safety Code, if the defendant has been
 previously convicted twice of an offense under that subchapter;
 (vi)  any felony under Chapter 32, Human
 Resources Code, or Chapter 31, 32, 35A, or 37, Penal Code, that
 involves a health care program, as defined by Section 35A.01, Penal
 Code;
 (vii)  a Class B misdemeanor under Chapter
 522, Business & Commerce Code;
 (viii)  a Class A misdemeanor under Section
 306.051, Business & Commerce Code;
 (ix)  any offense under Section 42.10, Penal
 Code;
 (x)  any offense under Section 46.06(a)(1)
 or 46.14, Penal Code;
 (xi)  any offense under Chapter 71, Penal
 Code;
 (xii)  any offense under Section 20.05,
 20.06, 20.07, 43.04, or 43.05, Penal Code; [or]
 (xiii)  an offense under Section 326.002,
 Business & Commerce Code; or
 (xiv)  a Class A misdemeanor or any felony
 under Section 545.420, Transportation Code, other than a Class A
 misdemeanor that is classified as a Class A misdemeanor based
 solely on conduct constituting a violation of Subsection (e)(2)(B)
 of that section;
 (C)  the proceeds gained from the commission of a
 felony listed in Paragraph (A) or (B) of this subdivision, a
 misdemeanor listed in Paragraph (B)(vii), (ix), (x), (xi), or (xii)
 of this subdivision, or a crime of violence;
 (D)  acquired with proceeds gained from the
 commission of a felony listed in Paragraph (A) or (B) of this
 subdivision, a misdemeanor listed in Paragraph (B)(vii), (ix), (x),
 (xi), or (xii) of this subdivision, or a crime of violence;
 (E)  used to facilitate or intended to be used to
 facilitate the commission of a felony under Section 15.031 or
 Chapter 43, Penal Code; or
 (F)  used to facilitate or intended to be used to
 facilitate the commission of an offense under Section 20.05, 20.06,
 or 20.07 or Chapter 20A, Penal Code.
 (b)  Article 59.01(2), Code of Criminal Procedure, as
 effective on January 1, 2022, is amended to read as follows:
 (2)  "Contraband" means property of any nature,
 including real, personal, tangible, or intangible, that is:
 (A)  used in the commission of:
 (i)  any first or second degree felony under
 the Penal Code;
 (ii)  any felony under Section 15.031(b),
 21.11, or 38.04 or Chapter 29, 30, 31, 32, 33, 33A, or 35, Penal
 Code;
 (iii)  any felony under Chapter 43, Penal
 Code, except as provided by Paragraph (B);
 (iv)  any felony under The Securities Act
 (Title 12, Government Code); or
 (v)  any offense under Chapter 49, Penal
 Code, that is punishable as a felony of the third degree or state
 jail felony, if the defendant has been previously convicted three
 times of an offense under that chapter;
 (B)  used or intended to be used in the commission
 of:
 (i)  any felony under Chapter 481, Health
 and Safety Code (Texas Controlled Substances Act);
 (ii)  any felony under Chapter 483, Health
 and Safety Code;
 (iii)  a felony under Chapter 151, Finance
 Code;
 (iv)  any felony under Chapter 20A or 34,
 Penal Code;
 (v)  a Class A misdemeanor under Subchapter
 B, Chapter 365, Health and Safety Code, if the defendant has been
 previously convicted twice of an offense under that subchapter;
 (vi)  any felony under Chapter 32, Human
 Resources Code, or Chapter 31, 32, 35A, or 37, Penal Code, that
 involves a health care program, as defined by Section 35A.01, Penal
 Code;
 (vii)  a Class B misdemeanor under Chapter
 522, Business & Commerce Code;
 (viii)  a Class A misdemeanor under Section
 306.051, Business & Commerce Code;
 (ix)  any offense under Section 42.10, Penal
 Code;
 (x)  any offense under Section 46.06(a)(1)
 or 46.14, Penal Code;
 (xi)  any offense under Chapter 71, Penal
 Code;
 (xii)  any offense under Section 20.05,
 20.06, 20.07, 43.04, or 43.05, Penal Code; [or]
 (xiii)  an offense under Section 326.002,
 Business & Commerce Code; or
 (xiv)  a Class A misdemeanor or any felony
 under Section 545.420, Transportation Code, other than a Class A
 misdemeanor that is classified as a Class A misdemeanor based
 solely on conduct constituting a violation of Subsection (e)(2)(B)
 of that section;
 (C)  the proceeds gained from the commission of a
 felony listed in Paragraph (A) or (B) of this subdivision, a
 misdemeanor listed in Paragraph (B)(vii), (ix), (x), (xi), or (xii)
 of this subdivision, or a crime of violence;
 (D)  acquired with proceeds gained from the
 commission of a felony listed in Paragraph (A) or (B) of this
 subdivision, a misdemeanor listed in Paragraph (B)(vii), (ix), (x),
 (xi), or (xii) of this subdivision, or a crime of violence;
 (E)  used to facilitate or intended to be used to
 facilitate the commission of a felony under Section 15.031 or
 Chapter 43, Penal Code; or
 (F)  used to facilitate or intended to be used to
 facilitate the commission of an offense under Section 20.05, 20.06,
 or 20.07 or Chapter 20A, Penal Code.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to property or proceeds seized on or after the effective date of
 this Act. Property or proceeds seized before the effective date of
 this Act are governed by the law in effect on the date the property
 or proceeds were seized, and the former law is continued in effect
 for that purpose. For purposes of this section, property or
 proceeds were seized before the effective date of this Act if any
 portion of the property or proceeds were seized before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *