Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2343 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2021

                    By: Geren, Morales of Maverick, Swanson H.B. No. 2343
 (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 8, 2021;
 April 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 13, 2021, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 13, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the purchase of food and beverages by the Department of
 Public Safety for certain persons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 411.0132, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 411.0132.  USE OF FUNDS TO SUPPORT CERTAIN PERSONS
 [PEACE OFFICER TRAINING]. The department[, subject to director
 approval,] may use appropriated funds to purchase food and
 beverages for:
 (1)  training functions required of peace officers of
 the department subject to director approval; and
 (2)  a person who is:
 (A)  activated to provide services in response to
 an emergency situation, incident, or disaster; and
 (B)  unable to leave or required to remain at the
 person's assignment area due to the emergency situation, incident,
 or disaster.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *