Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2352 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/24/2021

                    By: Parker, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 2352
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 17, 2021;
 May 18, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 24, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2352 By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an educational and vocational training pilot program
 for certain state jail felony defendants and certain inmates
 released on parole; changing parole eligibility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Articles 42A.562(a) and (f), Code of Criminal
 Procedure, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), a judge assessing
 punishment in a state jail felony case may suspend the imposition of
 the sentence and place the defendant on community supervision with
 the condition [conditions] that the defendant[:
 [(1)  submit at the beginning of the term of community
 supervision to confinement in a state jail felony facility for a
 term not to exceed 90 days; and
 [(2)]  participate in a program operated under Section
 493.034 [507.007], Government Code.
 (f)  A defendant placed on community supervision under this
 article must participate fully in the program described by
 Subsection (a) [(a)(2)]. The provisions of Subchapter P
 authorizing the judge to revoke a defendant's community supervision
 or otherwise sanction the defendant apply with respect to a
 defendant who violates the requirement of this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 72, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 72.036 to read as follows:
 Sec. 72.036.  TRAINING ON EDUCATIONAL AND VOCATIONAL
 TRAINING PILOT PROGRAM. The office shall develop and annually
 provide a training program to educate and inform judges on the
 components of the pilot program established under Section 493.034.
 SECTION 3.  Section 507.007, Government Code, is transferred
 to Chapter 493, Government Code, redesignated as Section 493.034,
 Government Code, and amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 493.034 [507.007].  EDUCATIONAL AND VOCATIONAL
 TRAINING PILOT PROGRAM. (a) The department shall establish a pilot
 program to provide educational and vocational training,
 employment, and reentry services to:
 (1)  defendants placed on community supervision [and
 required to serve a term of confinement in a state jail felony
 facility] under Article 42A.562, Code of Criminal Procedure; and
 (2)  inmates released on parole who are required to
 participate in the program as a condition of parole imposed under
 Section 508.1455.
 (b)  The department, in consultation with interested
 parties, shall determine the eligibility criteria for a defendant
 or inmate to participate in the pilot program, including requiring
 the defendant or inmate to arrange for suitable housing while
 participating in the program.
 (c)  The department, in consultation with interested
 parties, shall identify at least two and [determine] not more than
 four sites [locations] in this state in which the pilot program will
 operate. In identifying [determining] the sites [locations], the
 department shall consider locating the program in various regions
 throughout the state, including locations having a variety of
 population sizes, provided that the department shall select sites
 based on where the program will have the greatest likelihood of
 success and regardless of geographic region or population size.
 The department shall also give consideration to whether a risk and
 needs assessment is generally conducted before sentencing
 defendants in a particular location and to the degree to which local
 judges show support for the establishment of the program in a
 particular location.
 (d)  The department shall issue a request for proposals from
 public or private entities to provide services through the pilot
 program.  The department shall select one or more qualified
 applicants to provide services through the program to eligible
 defendants and inmates.
 (e)  The pilot program consists of approximately 180 days of
 employment-related services and support and must include:
 (1)  an initial period during which the defendant or
 inmate will:
 (A)  receive training and education related to the
 defendant's or inmate's vocational goals; and
 (B)  be employed by the provider;
 (2)  job placement services designed to provide
 employment for the defendant or inmate after the period described
 by Subdivision (1);
 (3)  assistance in obtaining a high school diploma or
 industry certification for applicable defendants and inmates;
 (4)  life-skills training, including information about
 budgeting and money management; and
 (5)  counseling and mental health services.
 (f)  The department shall limit the number of defendants and
 inmates who may participate in the pilot program to not more than 45
 individuals [defendants] per quarter per program location.
 (g)  The department shall pay providers not less than $40 per
 day for each participant.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter E, Chapter 508, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 508.1455 to read as follows:
 Sec. 508.1455.  EARLY RELEASE ON PAROLE FOR CERTAIN INMATES
 REQUIRED TO PARTICIPATE IN EDUCATIONAL AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING
 PILOT PROGRAM. (a) This section applies only to an inmate:
 (1)  who is serving a sentence for an offense under
 Chapter 481, Health and Safety Code, that is punishable as a felony
 of the third degree;
 (2)  who has not previously been convicted of a felony
 under Title 5, Penal Code, or under Chapter 43 or 71 of that code;
 and
 (3)  whose eligibility for parole is computed under
 Section 508.145(f).
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, a parole panel may
 release on parole an inmate described by Subsection (a)
 approximately 180 days before the date the inmate would be eligible
 for release on parole under Section 508.145(f).
 (c)  A parole panel releasing an inmate on parole under this
 section shall require as a condition of release on parole that the
 inmate participate in a program operated under Section 493.034, to
 begin immediately following the inmate's release on parole.
 (d)  For purpose of consideration by a parole panel for early
 release on parole under Subsection (b), the department shall
 annually identify not fewer than 100 inmates described by
 Subsection (a) who are suitable candidates for participation in a
 program operated under Section 493.034. The board and the
 department shall jointly adopt rules for identifying inmates under
 this subsection.  The rules must require the board or the department
 to notify an inmate that the inmate is being considered for release
 on parole under this section.
 (e)  The board shall adopt rules governing the release of an
 inmate on parole under this section.
 (f)  An inmate who is considered for but not granted release
 on parole under this section shall be considered for release on
 parole on the date that the inmate otherwise would have been
 considered for release on parole under this chapter.
 SECTION 5.  Article 42A.562(d), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is repealed.
 SECTION 6.  The change in law made by this Act applies to any
 inmate who is confined in a facility operated by or under contract
 with the Texas Department of Criminal Justice on or after the
 effective date of this Act, regardless of whether the offense for
 which the inmate is confined occurred before, on, or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 7.  The Texas Department of Criminal Justice is
 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose.  If
 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the department may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *