Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2365 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2021

                    By: Lopez (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 2365
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2021;
 May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the participation and reimbursement of certain military
 medical treatment facilities and affiliated health care providers
 under Medicaid.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 32.0275 to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.0275.  MILITARY MEDICAL TREATMENT FACILITIES AND
 AFFILIATED HEALTH CARE PROVIDERS; REIMBURSEMENT. (a) In this
 section, "military medical treatment facility" means a military
 medical treatment facility described by 10 U.S.C. Section 1073d(b),
 (c), or (d).
 (b)  This section applies only to a military medical
 treatment facility located in this state that has been verified as a
 Level 1 trauma center by the American College of Surgeons or an
 equivalent organization.
 (c)  A military medical treatment facility or a health care
 provider providing services at a military medical treatment
 facility is considered a provider under Medicaid for purposes of
 providing and receiving reimbursement for:
 (1)  inpatient emergency services; and
 (2)  related outpatient services to the extent those
 services are not available from an enrolled Medicaid provider at
 the time the services are needed.
 (d)  If a Medicaid recipient experiences an injury for which
 the recipient receives inpatient emergency services from a military
 medical treatment facility that is a hospital, the commission may
 not impose a 30-day spell of illness limitation or other
 requirement that limits the period of time the recipient may
 receive those services.
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *