Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2366 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    By: Buckley, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 2366
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 2; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to criminal conduct that endangers law enforcement;
 creating a criminal offense and increasing a criminal penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.13, Penal Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (c)  An offense under this section is a Class C misdemeanor,
 except that the offense is:
 (1)  a felony of the third degree if the conduct causes
 bodily injury to the officer; or
 (2)  a felony of the first degree if the conduct causes
 serious bodily injury to the officer.
 (d)  If conduct that constitutes an offense under this
 section also constitutes an offense under any other law, the actor
 may be prosecuted under this section or the other law, but not both.
 SECTION 2.  Title 10, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Chapter 50 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 50. FIREWORKS
 Sec. 50.01.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Consumer firework" and "fireworks" have the
 meanings assigned by 49 C.F.R. Section 173.59.
 (2)  "Law enforcement officer" means a person who is a
 peace officer under Article 2.12, Code of Criminal Procedure, or a
 person who is a federal law enforcement officer, as defined by 5
 U.S.C. Section 8331(20).
 Sec. 50.02.  UNLAWFUL USE OF FIREWORKS. (a) A person
 commits an offense if the person explodes or ignites fireworks with
 the intent to:
 (1)  interfere with the lawful performance of an
 official duty by a law enforcement officer; or
 (2)  flee from a person the actor knows is a law
 enforcement officer attempting to lawfully arrest or detain the
 actor.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsections (c) and (d), an
 offense under this section is a state jail felony.
 (c)  An offense under this section that involves any firework
 that is not a consumer firework is a second degree felony.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (c), an offense under this
 section is a felony of the first degree if the offense causes
 serious bodily injury to a person the actor knows is a law
 enforcement officer while the law enforcement officer is lawfully
 discharging an official duty or in retaliation or on account of an
 exercise of official power or performance of an official duty as a
 law enforcement officer.
 (e)  If conduct constituting an offense under this section
 also constitutes an offense under any other law, the actor may be
 prosecuted under this section, the other law, or both.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act. An
 offense committed before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of this
 section, an offense was committed before the effective date of this
 Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *