Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2448 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                    By: Canales (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 2448
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2021;
 May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the verification of the incarceration of an accused
 person in a criminal case for the purpose of discharging a surety's
 liability on a bail bond.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 17.16(a), Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A surety may before forfeiture relieve the surety of the
 surety's undertaking by:
 (1)  surrendering the accused into the custody of the
 sheriff of the county where the prosecution is pending; or
 (2)  delivering to the sheriff of the county in which
 the prosecution is pending and to the office of the prosecuting
 attorney an affidavit stating that the accused is incarcerated in:
 (A)  federal custody[, subject to Subsection
 (a-1)];
 (B)  the custody of any state; or
 (C)  any county of this state.
 SECTION 2.  Article 17.16(a-1), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  Article 17.16, Code of Criminal Procedure, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to a bail bond that is executed on
 or after the effective date of this Act. A bail bond executed
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the bail bond was executed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *