Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2530 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/11/2021

                    By: Ashby (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 2530
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2021;
 May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 11, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 12,
 Nays 0; May 11, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the rate of interest on certain tax refunds.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 111.064(a), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (a)  Except as otherwise provided by this section, for a
 refund under this chapter, interest is at the rate that is the
 lesser of the annual rate of interest earned on deposits in the
 state treasury during November [December] of the previous calendar
 year, as determined by the comptroller, or the rate set in Section
 111.060, and accrues on the amount found to be erroneously paid for
 a period:
 (1)  beginning on the later of 60 days after the date of
 payment or the due date of the tax report; and
 (2)  ending on, as determined by the comptroller,
 either the date of allowance of credit on account of the
 comptroller's final decision or audit or a date not more than 10
 days before the date of the refund warrant.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *